WI AB6 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 40.95 (1) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating an obsolete statutory provision.
Title
Eliminating an obsolete statutory provision.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-01-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-01-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-01-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-01-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Read a second time |
2015-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-22-2015 by committee on Rules |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-01-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2015-01-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-01-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab6 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB6.pdf |