WI AB652 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.07 (4), 20.536 (1) (k) and 25.14 (1) (a) (intro.); and to create 15.07 (1) (a) 7., 15.07 (5) (am), 15.77, 19.42 (10) (Lm), 19.42 (13) (km), 20.195, 25.17 (72), 25.17 (73), 25.90, 73.17, 230.08 (2) (yo) and chapter 555 of the statutes; relating to: creation of the Wisconsin Next Generation Reserve Board and Wisconsin next generation reserve fund, authorizing the State of Wisconsin Investment Board to provide certain advice, services, and facilities to state agencies and others, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Creation of the Wisconsin Next Generation Reserve Board and Wisconsin next generation reserve fund, authorizing the State of Wisconsin Investment Board to provide certain advice, services, and facilities to state agencies and others, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-07 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Marklein, Molepske Jr, Kooyenga, Berceau, Brooks, Hintz, Jorgensen, Kerkman, Petryk, Spanbauer and Tranel |
2012-03-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-02 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions |
2012-03-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab652 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB652.pdf |