WI AB732 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 814.78 (1), 814.79 (1), 814.80 (1) and 814.81 (1); to amend 46.215 (2) (c) 3., 46.22 (1) (e) 3. c., 48.02 (1d), 48.02 (2), 48.366 (8), subchapter IX (title) of chapter 48 [precedes 48.44], 48.44 (title), 48.44 (1), 48.45 (1) (a), 48.45 (1) (am), 48.45 (3), 118.163 (4), 125.07 (4) (d), 125.07 (4) (e) 1., 125.085 (3) (bt), 165.83 (1) (c) 1., 165.83 (1) (c) 2., 301.12 (2m), 301.12 (14) (a), 301.26 (3) (c), 301.26 (4) (d) 3., 301.26 (6) (a), 301.26 (7) (intro.), 301.26 (7) (a), 302.31 (7), 938.02 (1), 938.02 (10m), 938.12 (2), 938.18 (2), 938.183 (3), 938.255 (1) (intro.), 938.344 (3), 938.35 (1m), 938.355 (4) (b), 938.355 (4m) (a), 938.39, subchapter IX (title) of chapter 938 [precedes 938.44], 938.44, 938.45 (1) (a), 938.45 (3), 938.48 (4m) (title), 938.48 (4m) (a), 938.48 (4m) (b), 938.48 (14), 938.57 (3) (title), 938.57 (3) (a) 1., 938.57 (3) (a) 3., 938.57 (3) (b), 946.50 (intro.), 948.01 (1), 948.11 (2) (am) (intro.), 948.45 (1), 948.60 (2) (d), 948.61 (4), 961.455 (1), 961.46, 961.573 (2), 961.574 (2), 961.575 (1), 961.575 (2), 961.575 (3), 990.01 (3) and 990.01 (20); to repeal and recreate 48.02 (1d), 48.02 (2), 48.45 (1) (a), 48.45 (1) (am), 48.45 (3), 165.83 (1) (c) 1., 165.83 (1) (c) 2., 301.12 (14) (a), 301.26 (4) (d) 3., 938.02 (1), 938.02 (10m), 938.12 (2), 938.18 (2), 938.255 (1) (intro.), 938.35 (1m), 938.355 (4m) (a), 938.39, 938.45 (1) (a), 938.45 (3), 946.50 (intro.), 948.01 (1), 948.60 (2) (d), 948.61 (4), 990.01 (3) and 990.01 (20); and to create 20.410 (3) (gr), 301.26 (4) (dm), 301.265, 814.75 (1h), 814.78 (1j), 814.79 (1j), 814.80 (1j) and 814.81 (1j) of the statutes; relating to: the age at which a person who is alleged to have violated a criminal law, a civil law, or a municipal ordinance is subject to circuit court or municipal court jurisdiction rather than juvenile court jurisdiction; creating a community youth and family aids surcharge; authorizing the Department of Corrections to set the youth aids daily rates for care of a juvenile in a juvenile correctional facility or a treatment facility; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and making an appropriation.
Title
The age at which a person who is alleged to have violated a criminal law, a civil law, or a municipal ordinance is subject to circuit court or municipal court jurisdiction rather than juvenile court jurisdiction; creating a community youth and family aids surcharge; authorizing the Department of Corrections to set the youth aids daily rates for care of a juvenile in a juvenile correctional facility or a treatment facility; providing an exemption from rule-making procedures; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-01 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-24 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Corrections and the Courts | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab732 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB732.pdf |