WI AB776 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-13)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Published 4-5-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-13)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Published 4-5-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.75 (1d), 48.75 (1g) (b), 48.75 (1g) (c) (intro.) and 48.78 (2) (a); and to create 48.66 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: foster home licensing. (FE)
Title
Foster home licensing. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Published 4-5-2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-4-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 257 |
2018-04-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-3-2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-12-2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-12 | House | LRB correction |
2018-01-08 | House | Representative Quinn added as a coauthor |
2017-12-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2017-12-27 | House | Introduced |