WI AB79 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.455 (2) (hd) and 48.48 (19); and to create 20.437 (1) (hf), 814.75 (28), 814.76 (21), 944.35 and 973.05 (2m) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-03-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2024-03-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-07-06 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-05-23 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2023-05-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-01 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bodden |
2023-04-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-28 | House | Senator Hutton added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-01 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2023-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced |