WI AB8 | 2017 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-15-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Published 7-18-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-15-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Published 7-18-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 51.422 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: creating additional opioid treatment programs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating additional opioid treatment programs and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-17 | House | Published 7-18-2017 |
2017-07-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-17-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 27 |
2017-07-13 | House | Presented to the Governor on 7-13-2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-11-2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | LRB correction |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 withdrawn and returned to author |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Erpenbach, Carpenter, Vinehout, Johnson, C. Larson, L. Taylor, Hansen, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Risser and Ringhand |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Erpenbach, L. Taylor, Hansen, Carpenter, Vinehout, Johnson, C. Larson, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Ringhand and Risser |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-04-04 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-04-04 | House | Representatives Barca and Billings added as coauthors |
2017-04-04 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-04 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 34 |
2017-04-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 6 offered by Representative Shankland |
2017-04-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 34 |
2017-04-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representatives Barca, Hesselbein, Sinicki, Kessler, Young, Brostoff, Riemer, Goyke and Bowen |
2017-04-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Nygren |
2017-04-04 | House | Read a second time |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to calendar of 4-4-2017 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2017-03-30 | House | Report passage, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s.16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2017-03-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2017-03-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2017-03-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2017-03-21 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced |