WI AB911 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.370 (5) (cv) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for the Southeastern Wisconsin Fox River Commission and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Funding for the Southeastern Wisconsin Fox River Commission and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Adam Neylon [R] | Rep. Robin Vos [R] |
Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 348 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a cosponsor |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:15 PM on 2-15-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-13 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2018-02-08 | House | Senator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced |