WI AB937 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.28 (55p), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. m., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. m., 118.60 (2) (a) 10., 119.23 (2) (a) 10. and 121.02 (1) (k) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: incorporating cursive writing into the state model English language arts standards and requiring cursive writing in elementary grades. (FE)
Title
Incorporating cursive writing into the state model English language arts standards and requiring cursive writing in elementary grades. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Representative Bodden added as a coauthor |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2024-02-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-31 | House | Representative Rozar added as a coauthor |
2024-01-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced |