WI AJR133 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To create section 1m of article III of the constitution; Relating to: requiring photographic identification to vote in any election (first consideration).
Title
Requiring photographic identification to vote in any election (first consideration).
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Snyder [R] | Rep. Rick Gundrum [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] |
Rep. David Steffen [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Adopted (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-24 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2022-02-24 | House | Adopted, Ayes 59, Noes 36, Paired 4 |
2022-02-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 59, Noes 36 |
2022-02-24 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2022-02-24 | House | Point of order that Assembly Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Neubauer, Spreitzer, Hebl, Emerson, Brostoff, Subeck, Ohnstad, Hong, Doyle, Anderson, Hesselbein, Considine, Conley, Moore Omokunde, Vining, Andraca, B. Meyers, Riemer, Drake, Shankland, McGuire, Hintz, Snodgrass, S. Rodriguez, Cabrera and Ortiz-Velez |
2022-02-24 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 59, Noes 36 |
2022-02-24 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2022-02-24 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2022-02-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Spreitzer, Hebl, Neubauer, Emerson, Brostoff, Subeck, Ohnstad, Hong, Doyle, Anderson, Hesselbein, Considine, Conley, Moore Omokunde, Vining, Andraca, B. Meyers, Riemer, Drake, Shankland, McGuire, Hintz, Snodgrass, S. Rodriguez and Ortiz-Velez |
2022-02-24 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:40 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2022-02-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-18 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2022-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced |