WI SB115 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 448.72 (1) (a) and (b), 448.72 (1) (d), 448.72 (1) (f), 448.72 (2), 448.74 (1), 448.78 (3) (c) and 448.78 (4) (a), (b) and (c); to renumber and amend 448.70 (1), 448.70 (1m), 448.72 (1) (c), 448.72 (1) (e), 448.72 (3), 448.72 (4), 448.72 (5), 448.72 (6), 448.76, 448.78 (4) (intro.) and 448.82; to consolidate, renumber and amend 448.72 (intro.) and (1) (intro.) and 448.74 (intro.) and (2); to amend 15.406 (2) (intro.), 15.406 (2) (a), 48.981 (2) (a) 24., 146.81 (1) (em), 146.89 (1) (r), 146.997 (1) (d) 6., 180.1901 (1m) (br), 251.06 (3) (e) 2., 252.14 (1) (ar) 4m., 440.03 (13) (b) 23., 440.08 (2) (a) 27m., 446.02 (6m), subchapter V (title) of chapter 448 [precedes 448.70], 448.70 (2), 448.70 (3), 448.78 (intro.), 448.78 (1), 448.78 (3) (a), 448.78 (3) (b), 448.78 (5), 448.80, 448.84 (1), 448.84 (2), 448.86, 448.87 (2) (intro.) and (a), 448.87 (2) (b), 448.87 (2) (e), 448.87 (2) (g), 450.10 (3) (a) 5m., 632.895 (1) (b) 5. b. and 655.45 (1m); to repeal and recreate 440.08 (2) (a) 27m. and 448.86 (2); and to create 448.70 (1d), 448.70 (1r), (6) and (7), 448.71, 448.72 (7), 448.72 (11), 448.72 (12), 448.76 (7), 448.82 (1) and 448.86 (3) of the statutes; relating to: licensure of dietitians and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Title
Licensure of dietitians and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-13 | Senate amendment 2 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Vinehout | |
2010-04-06 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-06 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Public Health, Senior Issues, Long-Term Care, and Job Creation, Ayes 4, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Public Health, Senior Issues, Long-Term Care, and Job Creation, Ayes 4, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Public Health, Senior Issues, Long-Term Care, and Job Creation, Ayes 4, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-31 | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Vinehout | |
2010-03-31 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Vinehout | |
2009-09-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-30 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health, Senior Issues, Long-Term Care, and Job Creation | |
2009-03-13 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb115 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB115.pdf |