WI SB148 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-19-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-19-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.92 (3) (a) and 165.92 (3) (b) 1.; and to create 165.92 (3) (c) of the statutes; relating to: liability for actions of tribal law enforcement officers when enforcing state laws.
Title
Liability for actions of tribal law enforcement officers when enforcing state laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Published 5-19-2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-5-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 232 | |
2010-05-04 | Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-23-2010 | |
2010-04-16 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-13 | Made a special order of business at 11:56 A.M. on 4-15-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 | |
2009-10-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-10-29 | Received from Senate | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-10-27 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-10-27 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-27 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-10-27 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-22 | Placed on calendar 10-27-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-07 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-07 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 4, Noes 1 | |
2009-10-07 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-10-06 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-23 | Public hearing held | |
2009-04-06 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-04-06 | Introduced |