WI SB148 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Published 6-22-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Published 6-22-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 194.01 (7), 340.01 (74), 344.01 (2) (g), subchapter IV (title) of chapter 346 [precedes 346.23], 346.23 (1), 346.23 (2), 346.24 (1), 346.24 (2), 346.24 (3), 346.28 (title), 346.28 (2), 346.30 (1) (a), 346.37 (1) (a) 2., 346.37 (1) (c) 2., 346.37 (1) (c) 3., 346.37 (1) (c) 4., 346.37 (1) (d) 1., 346.37 (1) (d) 2., 346.37 (1) (e) 1., 346.37 (1) (e) 2., 346.38 (1), 346.38 (2), 346.43 (1) (a), 346.47 (1), subchapter XII (title) of chapter 346 [precedes 346.77], 346.80 (5), 346.82 (title), 346.82 (1), 346.95 (6), 347.245 (1), 347.489 (title), 347.489 (1), 349.236 (title), 349.236 (1) (b), 349.236 (1) (c) and 349.236 (2); and to create 340.01 (43fg), 340.01 (43fs), 341.0585, 346.807, 346.94 (18m), 347.02 (1) (k), 347.489 (1m) and 347.489 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: personal delivery devices and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Personal delivery devices and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Published 6-22-2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 6-21-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 13 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-20-2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a second time |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-02 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kapenga |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced |