WI SB211 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.095 (title) and 450.095 (3); and to create 49.46 (2) (bg), 450.01 (16) (L), 450.095 (1) (ag) and (ar) and 450.095 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: permitting pharmacists to prescribe certain contraceptives, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Permitting pharmacists to prescribe certain contraceptives, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-10-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 1 |
2023-09-15 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-07-14 | Senate | Senators Hesselbein and Carpenter added as coauthors |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Representatives Snodgrass and Emerson added as cosponsors |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Representatives Joers and Andraca added as cosponsors |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Representatives Madison and Clancy added as cosponsors |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |