WI SB217 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 25.40 (1) (bn) and 77.61 (21) of the statutes; Relating to: depositing sales tax revenue from the sale of motor vehicles and motor vehicle parts, accessories, and services into the transportation fund. (FE)
Title
Depositing sales tax revenue from the sale of motor vehicles and motor vehicle parts, accessories, and services into the transportation fund. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |