WI SB259 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Published 11-17-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Published 11-17-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 138.14 (3); and to create 138.14 (3) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: payday loans.
Title
Payday loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Senate | Published 11-17-2023 |
2023-11-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-16-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 37 |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-15-2023 |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2023-11-15 | Senate | LRB correction |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2023-11-14 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-13 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-11-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-09-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-07-12 | Senate | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Introduced |