WI SB3 | 2017 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-19-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-19-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 961.443 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: immunity from revocation of probation, parole, or extended supervision for certain controlled substance offenses.
Title
Immunity from revocation of probation, parole, or extended supervision for certain controlled substance offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Representative Considine added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senator Johnson added as a coauthor |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/jr7/sen/bill/sb3 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/JR7/SB3.pdf |