WI SB40 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 38.41 (3) (d) of the statutes; relating to: advanced manufacturing skills grants for technical colleges.
Title
Advanced manufacturing skills grants for technical colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1 |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Introduced |