WI SB413 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 236.13 (1) (e); and to create 86.074 of the statutes; Relating to: highway setback areas and the Department of Transportation's authority to approve subdivision plats. (FE)
Title
Highway setback areas and the Department of Transportation's authority to approve subdivision plats. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Senate | Published 3-22-2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 157 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-21 | House | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:22 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tomczyk |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Introduced |