WI SB470 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 111.322 (2m) (a) and 111.322 (2m) (b); and to create 50.373, 103.035, 106.54 (10) (c) and 146.998 of the statutes; Relating to: minimum nurse staffing ratios in hospitals, registered nurses' right to refuse a work assignment, prohibiting mandatory overtime for registered nurses, and providing a penalty.
Title
Minimum nurse staffing ratios in hospitals, registered nurses' right to refuse a work assignment, prohibiting mandatory overtime for registered nurses, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Introduced |