WI SB486 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.755 (1) (b), 302.46 (1) (a), 757.05 (1) (a), 814.63 (1) (c), 814.63 (2), 814.85 (1) (a) and 814.86 (1); and to create 30.68 (1) and 30.80 (2c) of the statutes; Relating to: regulating the operation of recreational vessels carrying persons under the age of ten and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulating the operation of recreational vessels carrying persons under the age of ten and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb486 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB486.pdf |