WI SB488 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 70-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 70-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 30.025 (1e) (title) and (a), 107.001 (2) and 293.01 (8); to renumber and amend 30.025 (1e) (b), 30.123 (8) (c) and 87.30 (2); to amend 20.370 (2) (gh), 20.455 (1) (gh), 20.566 (7) (e), 20.566 (7) (v), 25.46 (7), 29.604 (4) (intro.), 29.604 (4) (c) (intro.), 30.025 (1m) (intro.), 30.025 (1m) (c), 30.025 (1s) (a), 30.025 (2), 30.025 (2g) (b) (intro.), 30.025 (4), 30.12 (3m) (c) (intro.), 30.133 (2), 30.19 (4) (c) (intro.), 30.195 (2) (c) (intro.), 44.40 (5), 70.375 (1) (as), 70.375 (1) (bm), 70.38 (2), 70.395 (1e), 70.395 (2) (dc) 1., 70.395 (2) (dc) 4., 70.395 (2) (fm), 70.395 (2) (h) 1., 107.001 (1), 107.01 (intro.), 107.01 (2), 107.02, 107.03, 107.04, 107.11, 107.12, 107.20 (1), 107.20 (2), 107.30 (8), 107.30 (15), 107.30 (16), 160.19 (12), 196.491 (3) (a) 3. b., 196.491 (4) (b) 2., 281.65 (2) (a), 281.75 (17) (b), 287.13 (5) (e), 289.35, 289.62 (2) (g) 2. and 6., 292.01 (1m), chapter 293 (title), 293.01 (5), 293.01 (7), 293.01 (9), 293.01 (12), 293.01 (18), 293.01 (25), 293.21 (1) (a), 293.25 (2) (a), 293.25 (4), 293.37 (4) (b), 293.47 (1) (b), 293.50 (1) (b), 293.50 (2) (intro.), 293.50 (2) (a), 293.50 (2) (b), 293.51 (1), 293.65 (3) (a), 293.65 (3) (b), 293.86, chapter 295 (title), 295.16 (4) (f), 299.85 (7) (a) 2. and 4., 299.95, 323.60 (5) (d) 3. and 710.02 (2) (d); and to create 20.370 (2) (gi), 29.604 (7m), 30.025 (4m), 31.23 (3) (e), 87.30 (2) (b), 293.01 (12m), subchapter III of chapter 295 [precedes 295.40] and 323.60 (1) (gm) of the statutes; relating to: regulation of ferrous metallic mining and related activities, procedures for obtaining approvals from the Department of Natural Resources for the construction of utility facilities, making an appropriation, and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Regulation of ferrous metallic mining and related activities, procedures for obtaining approvals from the Department of Natural Resources for the construction of utility facilities, making an appropriation, and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, pursuant to Senate Rule 46 (2)(c) |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 3 offered by Senators Jauch, Schultz, King, Holperin, Hansen, Erpenbach, T. Cullen, C. Larson, Wirch, S. Coggs, Taylor and Vinehout |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance |
2012-03-06 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-03-01 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb488 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB488.pdf |