WI SB488 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.085 (3) (a) 3. and 134.405 (3) (a) 1.; and to create 6.34 (3) (a) 13., 125.085 (1) (f), 134.66 (1) (c) 4., 134.695 (1) (cm), 134.695 (2) (b) 6., 134.71 (8) (a) 10. and 450.11 (1b) (a) 2. e. of the statutes; Relating to: using a tribal identification card for various purposes.
Title
Using a tribal identification card for various purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 226 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-25 | House | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Nass added as a coauthor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Introduced |