WI SB526 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.192 (1) (ar) and 238.28 of the statutes; Relating to: industry cluster partnerships and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Industry cluster partnerships and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 2 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 4 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 4 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 3 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Darling |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Commerce, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Commerce, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Commerce |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb526 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB526.pdf |