WI SB557 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (4) (bi); and to create 23.321, 23.323, 59.691, 60.625, 61.352, 62.232 and 101.02 (23) of the statutes; relating to: notices concerning construction near or on lakes, streams, or wetlands that are given to applicants for building permits and other construction approvals, requiring the Department of Natural Resources to furnish informational brochures about wetlands laws, requiring the Department of Natural Resources to provide evaluations and statements about whether certain land contains wetlands, and making an appropriation.
Title
Notices concerning construction near or on lakes, streams, or wetlands that are given to applicants for building permits and other construction approvals, requiring the Department of Natural Resources to furnish informational brochures about wetlands laws, requiring the Department of Natural Resources to provide evaluations and statements about whether certain land contains wetlands, and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 373 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Report correctly enrolled on 5-7-2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-22 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-22 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-22 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on calendar 4-22-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-04-14 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-14 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-08 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-08 | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-07 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-02 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-02 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-02 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-01 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-31 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-26 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Kreitlow | |
2010-03-26 | LRB correction | |
2010-03-17 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-16 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-11 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Environment | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced |