WI SB6 | 2017 | January Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-12-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-12-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 118.40 (3) (f) and 118.40 (3) (g) 2.; to amend 20.255 (2) (fp), 20.255 (2) (fq), 66.0137 (4), 118.40 (2x) (e) 1., 118.40 (2x) (e) 2., 118.40 (3m) (c), 120.13 (2) (g), 185.983 (1) (intro.) and 632.87 (1); and to create 20.255 (2) (fq), 118.40 (2x) (cm), 118.40 (2x) (e) 1m., 118.40 (2x) (e) 3., 118.40 (3) (f) 2., 118.40 (3o), 120.12 (26), 609.717 and 632.87 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing the director of the Office of Educational Opportunity in the University of Wisconsin System to contract for the operation of a recovery charter school, insurance coverage of mental health treatment provided by a recovery charter school, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Authorizing the director of the Office of Educational Opportunity in the University of Wisconsin System to contract for the operation of a recovery charter school, insurance coverage of mental health treatment provided by a recovery charter school, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Darling |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/jr7/sen/bill/sb6 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/JR7/SB6.pdf |