WI SB614 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 30.29 (1); to repeal and recreate 30.29 (3) (title); and to create 30.29 (1) (a), 30.29 (1) (c), 30.29 (3) (i) and 30.29 (3m) of the statutes; relating to: the operation of motor vehicles on the exposed beds of outlying waters to control Phragmites australis.
Title
The operation of motor vehicles on the exposed beds of outlying waters to control Phragmites australis.
Sponsors
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Sen. David Hansen [D] | Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Rep. John Nygren [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. James Soletski [D] | Rep. John Townsend [R] | Rep. Karl Van Roy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 377 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-04-26 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-26-2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-15 | Made a special order of business at 12:09 P.M. on 4-20-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | |
2010-04-15 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-15 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on calendar 4-15-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-14 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-04-14 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e) | |
2010-04-09 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-09 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-09 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-07 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Hansen | |
2010-04-01 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-31 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced |