WI SB623 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 961.335 (4) (c) and 961.335 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: permits issued to a state crime laboratory to possess, manufacture, or use a controlled substance.
Title
Permits issued to a state crime laboratory to possess, manufacture, or use a controlled substance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Representative Hintz added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Wachs added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Zepnick added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Hesselbein added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Johnson added as a cosponsor |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb623 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB623.pdf |