WI SB623 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 939.621 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: increased maximum terms of imprisonment for domestic abuse repeaters and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Increased maximum terms of imprisonment for domestic abuse repeaters and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Representatives Barca, Vruwink and Shankland added as cosponsors |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb623 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB623.pdf |