WI SB682 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 893.33 (6m); and to create 893.33 (6m) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: creating an exception to the 40-year recording requirement for recorded access easements.
Title
Creating an exception to the 40-year recording requirement for recorded access easements.
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] |
Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Published 3-12-2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-11-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 174 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-10-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:42 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senator Stafsholt added as a coauthor |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Housing, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Commerce and Trade |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Introduced |