WI SB687 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Published 3-30-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Published 3-30-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 187.11 of the statutes; Relating to: specifying Crossroads College as the entity in which the Church of Christ's property vests if the Church of Christ becomes defunct or is dissolved.
Title
Specifying Crossroads College as the entity in which the Church of Christ's property vests if the Church of Christ becomes defunct or is dissolved.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | Published 3-30-2024 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 252 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:27 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 23, Noes 9 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Introduced |