WI SB709 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: construction and renovation of a veterans village. (FE)
Title
Construction and renovation of a veterans village. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] |
Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter and Wirch |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Representative Skowronski added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Introduced |