WI SB843 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.27 (2) (cr) of the statutes; Relating to: a University of Wisconsin System nonresident tuition exemption. (FE)
Title
A University of Wisconsin System nonresident tuition exemption. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Representative Myers added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-12-26 | Senate | Introduced |