WI SB876 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (4) (hq) and 20.370 (4) (mq) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for education on solid waste reduction, recovery, and recycling and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Funding for education on solid waste reduction, recovery, and recycling and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senator Agard added as a coauthor |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Introduced |