WI SB9 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Published 4-22-2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Published 4-22-2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.10 of the statutes; relating to: a tort action for intentional misrepresentation in a residential real estate transaction.
Title
A tort action for intentional misrepresentation in a residential real estate transaction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Published 4-22-2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 4 | |
2009-04-08 | Presented to the Governor on 4-8-2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-1-2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2009-03-26 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-03-26 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 69, Noes 28 | |
2009-03-26 | Rules suspended | |
2009-03-26 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-03-26 | Read a second time | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on calendar 3-26-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-03-17 | Withdrawn from committee on Consumer Protection and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Consumer Protection | |
2009-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-24 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-02-24 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-02-24 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-24 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-02-24 | Read a second time | |
2009-02-24 | Senator Miller added as a coauthor | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on calendar 2-24-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-02-12 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-02-12 | Report passage recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-02-11 | Executive action taken | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing held | |
2009-01-21 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-01-21 | Introduced |