WI SJR44 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: commending Coach John Vodenlich on receiving the 2015 Wisconsin Intercollegiate Athletic Conference's Baseball Coach of the Year award.
Title
Commending Coach John Vodenlich on receiving the 2015 Wisconsin Intercollegiate Athletic Conference's Baseball Coach of the Year award.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-18 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 9-16-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/joint_resolution/sjr44 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SJR44.pdf |