WV HB103 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Approved by Governor 6/7/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Approved by Governor 6/7/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide technical cleanup and clarifying language to the 2018 House Bill 4015, which reformed the management of state vehicles.
Title
Relating to the management and inventory of state vehicles
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Effective June 5, 2018 (Roll No. 15) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 14) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Effective June 5, 2018 (Roll No. 582) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 581) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 580) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 14) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Effective June 5, 2018 (Roll No. 582) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 581) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 580) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Approved by Governor 6/7/18 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 6/7/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-05-23 | House | To Governor 5/23/18 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | To Governor 5/23/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-05-21 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Effective June 5, 2018 (Roll No. 15) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 14) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-05-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-05-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-05-21 | House | Effective June 5, 2018 (Roll No. 582) |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 581) |
2018-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-05-21 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 580) |
2018-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-05-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-05-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-05-20 | House | Immediate consideration |
2018-05-20 | House | Reference dispensed |
2018-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 3 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 3 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17A | 3 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 12 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 12 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 12 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 12 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |