WV HB124 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-18 - Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Making a supplementary appropriation to the Senate, to the House of Delegates, to the Joint Expenses, to the Department of Administration, the Department of Commerce, and to various other state agencies
Title
Making a supplementary appropriation to the Senate, to the House of Delegates, to the Joint Expenses, to the Department of Administration, the Department of Commerce, and to various other state agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Tabled on 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-05-18 | Placed at foot of bills on the calendar | |
2010-05-18 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-05-17 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-05-17 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2010-05-16 | Read 1st time | |
2010-05-16 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-05-16 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-05-14 | To House Finance | |
2010-05-14 | Introduced in House | |
2010-05-14 | To Finance | |
2010-05-14 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1024 (Same As) 2010-06-07 - Chapter 11, Acts, 1st Extraordinary Session, 2010