WV HB2101 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 40, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 40, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating obsolete government entities
Title
Eliminating obsolete government entities
Sponsors
Del. Jim Morgan [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. Larry Faircloth [R] | Del. Michael Folk [R] |
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 36) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 50) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 4) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 50) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 4) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 40, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/11/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-02-15 | House | Approved by Governor 2/11/16 - House Journal |
2016-02-11 | House | Approved by Governor 2/11/16 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | To Governor 2/9/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-02-10 | House | To Governor 2/9/16 - House Journal |
2016-02-09 | House | To Governor 2/9/16 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-02-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 36) |
2016-02-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 50) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Having been read 2nd time 2/2/16 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/2/16, amend pending |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2016-01-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-01-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-01-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 4) |
2016-01-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-21 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2016-01-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-20 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-01-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-01-19 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-01-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-13 | House | To Government Organization |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5P | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 12C | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 12C | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |