WV HB2109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2109
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committed to Finance on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Committed to Finance on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend the maximum period of confinement a judge may impose for certain, first-time probationary violations from 60 days to six months. The bill also provides judges greater sentencing discretion for certain, subsequent violations of probation.
Title
Extending the maximum period of confinement a judge may impose for certain, first-time probationary violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Committed to Finance on 3rd reading |
2019-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-09 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-09 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2109 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Committed to Finance on 3rd reading
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 12 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |