WV HB2531 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting trained nurses to provide mental health services in a medication-assisted treatment program
Title
Permitting trained nurses to provide mental health services in a medication-assisted treatment program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 439) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 330) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 49) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 330) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 49) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/9/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/9/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 439) |
2019-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 330) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/2/19 |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-31 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-31 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 49) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-01-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-18 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-18 | House | Do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-18 | House | Originating in House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5Y | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |