WV HB2615 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the West Virginia Small Business Capital Act. It exempts the offer and sale of certain securities from the Uniform Securities Act. This article is new; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
West Virginia Small Business Capital Act
Sponsors
Del. Patrick Lane [R] | Del. Larry Faircloth [R] | Del. Carol Miller [R] | Del. Cindy Frich [R] |
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 332) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 76) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 76) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 224, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-24 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 332) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 76) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-15 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2016-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, House Calendar |
2016-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-22 | House | To House Finance |
2016-01-22 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-01-13 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-13 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Finance |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 3 | 301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
32 | 5 | 501 | New Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5 | 505 | New Code | See Bill Text |