WV HB2665 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this supplemental appropriation bill is to add a new item of appropriation in the aforesaid account for the designated spending unit for the fiscal year 2019.
Title
Supplemental appropriation for PEIA Rainy Day Fee
Sponsors
Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 709) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 708) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 509) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 509) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 318) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 317) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 708) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 509) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 509) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 318) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 317) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 32, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/13/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 709) |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 708) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 509) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 509) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 318) |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 317) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-01-25 | House | To House Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-25 | House | To Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB423 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - To Finance