WV HB2831 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 46, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 46, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to declare certain claims against the state to be moral obligations of the state and to authorize payments therefor from the following funds: GENERAL REVENUE FUND:Â Â Â $773,043.66 SPECIAL REVENUE FUNDS:Â Â Â Â Â Â Â $6,769.71 STATE ROAD FUND: Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â $2,436,715.61 Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â TOTAL:Â Â Â Â Â Â Â Â $3,216,528.98
Title
Finding and declaring certain claims against the state and its agencies to be moral obligations of the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 664) (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 663) (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 446) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 446) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 324) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 323) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 663) (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 446) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 446) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 324) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 323) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 46, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 664) |
2019-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 663) |
2019-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 446) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 446) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amends pend. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 324) |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 323) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-04 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-04 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |