WV HB3136 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB3136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Title
Relating to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Sponsors
Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. John Hardy [R] | Del. Jim Butler [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Del. Vernon Criss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed at foot of bills on third reading |
2019-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/27/19 |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-21 | House | Originating in House Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB3136 (Carry Over) 2019-03-09 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar