WV HB4126 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-29 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Status: Introduced on January 22 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-29 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require that the Division of Culture and History and the commissioner make specific use of the archives library in the West Virginia Science and Culture Center; prohibiting the sale of food and drink in that building and merging the archives library with the lending library; locating the gift shop in the basement with the museum; and giving the Archives and History Commission oversight and administrative authority over the state historian and archivist.
Title
Prohibiting the Commissioner of Culture and History from merging the archives library and the lending library
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-29 | Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-29 | From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-28 | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2008-02-27 | Deferred | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-26 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-26 | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-01-22 | To House Government Organization | |
2008-01-22 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-22 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-22 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB328 (Same As) 2008-01-24 - To Government Organization
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4126&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |