WV HB4143 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Chapter 80, Acts, 2010
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Chapter 80, Acts, 2010
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to strengthen the authority of the Office of Emergency Medical Services. It requires applicants for certification to allow the state police access to personal background information; requires certified persons to report violations and provides immunity from civil liability for reporting violations; removes automatic stay on appeal and increases criminal penalties for violations.
Title
Relating to emergency medical services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Chapter 80, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 397) | |
2010-03-13 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 396) | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-12 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-12 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 26) | |
2010-03-12 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 26) | |
2010-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-12 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 25) | |
2010-03-12 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-12 | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-12 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-12 | Committee Amendment Reported | |
2010-03-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-12 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-11 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-11 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-11 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-09 | Motion | |
2010-03-09 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-02-18 | To Government Organization | |
2010-02-18 | To Government Organization | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Passed House (Roll No. 48) | |
2010-02-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-17 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-16 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-15 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-12 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-03 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-03 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-01-19 | To House Government Organization | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in House | |
2010-01-19 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 4C | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 5a | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 4C | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4143&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |