WV HB4621 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 12, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 12, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expiring funds to the Board of Risk and Insurance Management, Patient Injury Compensation Fund from the Board of Risk and Insurance Management Medical Liability Fund
Title
Expiring funds to the Board of Risk and Insurance Management, Patient Injury Compensation Fund from the Board of Risk and Insurance Management Medical Liability Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 296) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 295) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 296) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 295) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Chapter 12, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-19 | House | Approved by Governor 3/19/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/19/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/19/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/14 |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 2) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 1) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 296) |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 295) |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | Originating in House Finance |