WV HB4654 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the Board of Registered Professional Nurses executive secretary’s experience requirements.
Title
Relating to the Executive Secretary of the Board of Registered Professional Nurses
Sponsors
Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Denise Campbell [D] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] |
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 397) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 396) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 325) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 325) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 311) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 396) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 325) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 325) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 311) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 310) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 182, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/10/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/10/16 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/10/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/16 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 397) |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 396) |
2016-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2016-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 325) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 325) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 311) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 310) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | To House Government Organization |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-22 | House | To Government Organization |
2016-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |