WV HB4668 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the misdemeanor crime of trespass for entering a structure that has been condemned
Title
Creating the misdemeanor crime of trespass for entering a structure that has been condemned
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Edward Evans [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] |
Del. Terry Waxman [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Evan Worrell [R] | Del. Mike Pushkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 696) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 695) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House reconsidered concurrence in Senate amendment (Roll No. 694) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 468) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 302) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 695) (Y: 70 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House reconsidered concurrence in Senate amendment (Roll No. 694) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 468) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 302) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 94, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 696) |
2020-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 695) |
2020-03-06 | House | House reconsidered concurrence in Senate amendment (Roll No. 694) |
2020-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment (Voice vote) |
2020-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 468) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 302) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-04 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 3B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |