WV HB4726 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to enhance the state’s mine safety and environmental statutes. The bill makes findings. The bill eliminates the Department of Environmental Protection Office of Explosives and Blasting and consolidates the remaining duties and responsibilities related to blasting to the Department of Environmental Protection Division of Mining and Reclamation. The bill adds blasting oversight. The bill provides that the Department of Environmental Protection shall revise rules on hydrologic protection and stormwater runoff analyses on mining operations and to promulgate rules that conform with the federal regulations requirements to minimize the disturbances to the prevailing hydrologic balance at a mine site and in associated off-site areas. The bill provides that cumulative hydrologic impact assessment may be conducted. The bill requires a statement of probable hydrologic consequences and to prevent flooding. The bill requires the Department of Environmental Protection to follow deadlines for approving or denying applications for site specific water quality criteria. The bill modifies certain findings, ventilation requirements, safety inspection for gases, and roof or rib requirements. The bill permits the director to amend penalties. The bill provides that state mine rescue teams may serve as back up mine rescue teams for mines in this state. The bill provides that the Director of the Office of Miners’ Health, Safety and Training shall have the authority to amend rules for the use of diesel equipment in the state’s mines. The bill provides that in hearings over suspensions for positive drug tests, the state Board of Appeals to allow evidence of testing procedures and test results be introduced through notarized affidavits from Medical Review Officers and testify if necessary. The bill provides for telephonic testimony under oath. The bill provides that the penalty for not reporting accidents in fifteen minutes to the Office of Miners’ Health, Safety and Training be modified to “up to $100,000”. The bill provides that the Director of Office of Miners’ Health, Safety and Training shall have the authority to modify assessed penalties and penalties and that assessed penalties may be modified by the state Board of Appeals based on a vote of two board members. The bill allows company input into state supervisory training and how it is to be scheduled during the year. The bill provides a method in case a miners’ wireless emergency communication device fails.Â
Title
Relating to coal mining generally
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 491) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 551) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 349) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 321) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 152) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 551) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 349) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 321) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 152) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal |
2016-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 551) |
2016-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 349) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Kessler Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 321) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-26 | House | Originating in House Energy |